NJ S2340 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A818
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Singleton)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Singleton)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides mortgage payment relief, income tax relief, consumer reporting protection, and eviction protection for residential property owners, tenants, and other consumers, during time of coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.
Title
Provides mortgage payment relief, income tax relief, consumer reporting protection, and eviction protection for residential property owners, tenants, and other consumers, during time of coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Motion to Suspend Rules (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4034 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4034 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-0) (Singleton) |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Motion Suspend 17:14 (Voice) (Singleton) |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-22-3) |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Substituted for A4034/4226 (ACS/1R) |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S2340 (Carry Over) 2020-10-29 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Singleton)
A4034 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S2340 (2R)
A4226 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - Combined with A4034 (ACS)
A4034 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S2340 (2R)
A4226 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - Combined with A4034 (ACS)