NJ S2333 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A232
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A2060
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A2060
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes process for consideration of offers from short sale buyers during residential mortgage foreclosures.
Title
Establishes process for consideration of offers from short sale buyers during residential mortgage foreclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Substituted by A2060 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2060 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.157.
A232 (Carry Over) 2015-03-09 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora)
A232 (Carry Over) 2015-03-09 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora)