NJ S233 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future S819
Note: Carry Foward to future A2150
Note: Carry Over of previous S2262
Note: Carry Over of previous A4561

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (32-0) (Singleton)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain disclosures by providers of commercial financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain disclosures by providers of commercial financing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-20SenateSenate Amendment (32-0) (Singleton)
2021-12-02SenateSenate Amendment (32-0) (Singleton)
2021-06-16SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S233 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (32-0) (Singleton)
S233 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (32-0) (Singleton)
S2262 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A3891 (Same As) 2020-03-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A4561 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback