NJ S2329 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2582
Note: Carry Over of previous S2504
Note: Carry Over of previous S2504
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises membership of New Jersey State Board of Cosmetology and Hairstyling.
Title
Revises membership of New Jersey State Board of Cosmetology and Hairstyling.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1629 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
A2582 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S2504 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2582 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S2504 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2329 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2329_I1.HTM |