NJ S2329 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for cash assistance benefits under Work First New Jersey program; appropriates $17 million.
Title
Revises requirements for cash assistance benefits under Work First New Jersey program; appropriates $17 million.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3905 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3905 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-1) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (54-1-23) |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Substituted for A3905 (1R) |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (26-0) |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
A3905 (Same As) 2020-05-14 - Substituted by S2329 (1R)