NJ S2328 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4833
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A621 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A621 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits bowling alleys, including alleys licensed to sell alcoholic beverages, to conduct amusement games.
Title
Permits bowling alleys, including alleys licensed to sell alcoholic beverages, to conduct amusement games.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Substituted by A621 (1R) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A621 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.152.
A4833 (Carry Over) 2015-12-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
A4833 (Carry Over) 2015-12-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee