NJ S2318 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires newborn infant screening for tongue tie.
Title
Requires newborn infant screening for tongue tie.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Rep. Jason O'Donnell [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Linda Stender [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3390 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3390 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-3-9) |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Substituted for A3390 |
2013-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-1) |
2012-12-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-11-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3390 (Same As) 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S2318