NJ S2305 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Motion To Table (19-16) (Weinberg)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes primary health care plan with optional riders in SHBP for public employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes primary health care plan with optional riders in SHBP for public employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22SenateMotion To Table (19-16) (Weinberg)
2017-06-22SenateMotion Relieve From Committee (Beck)
2016-10-21SenateReviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to enact with amendment
2016-06-06SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4550 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback