NJ S2265 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S700
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (25-12) (Gordon)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (25-12) (Gordon)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to pay its pension contributions quarterly on July 15, October 15, January 15 and April 15.
Title
Requires State to pay its pension contributions quarterly on July 15, October 15, January 15 and April 15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Veto Override (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Veto Override (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3487 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3487 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Veto Override (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3487 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3487 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Senate | Lost in the Senate AVOR (25-12) (Gordon) |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (62-13-4) |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (48-31-0) |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Wolfe) |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Substituted for A3487 |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-3) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2265 (Carry Over) 2014-12-18 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (25-12) (Gordon)
A3487 (Same As) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by S2265
A3487 (Same As) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by S2265