NJ S2256 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A3362 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts certain properties acquired by municipalities from county, school, and fire district taxes immediately upon aquisition.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts certain properties acquired by municipalities from county, school, and fire district taxes immediately upon aquisition.*

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-13SenateSubstituted by A3362 (2R)
2014-01-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2013-03-04SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2013-03-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-10-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3362 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.261.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback