NJ S2245 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous A489
Note: Legislation replaced by A3414

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-12-19 - Substituted by A3414 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Modifies regulation of student permits by NJ State Board of Cosmetology and Hairstyling and establishes oversight of individuals seeking employment as shampoo technicians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies regulation of student permits by NJ State Board of Cosmetology and Hairstyling and establishes oversight of individuals seeking employment as shampoo technicians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-12-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-19SenateSubstituted by A3414 (1R)
2024-12-09SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2024-06-10SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2024-06-10SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A489 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
A3414 (Same As) 2025-02-03 - Approved P.L.2025, c.18.
A3414 (Replaced by) 2025-02-03 - Approved P.L.2025, c.18.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback