NJ S2213 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2592
Note: Carry Foward to future S3924
Note: Carry Foward to future S281
Note: Carry Over of previous A6089
Note: Carry Over of previous S4325
Note: Carry Foward to future S3924
Note: Carry Foward to future S281
Note: Carry Over of previous A6089
Note: Carry Over of previous S4325
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Waives pet adoption fees for certain military personnel and veterans.
Title
Waives pet adoption fees for certain military personnel and veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2213 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2213 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2213 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3226 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A6089 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S4325 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2213 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2213 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3226 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A6089 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S4325 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2213 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2213_I1.HTM |