NJ S220 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S131
Note: Carry Foward to future A3928
Note: Carry Over of previous S1406
Note: Carry Over of previous A2472
Note: Carry Foward to future A3928
Note: Carry Over of previous S1406
Note: Carry Over of previous A2472
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes total property tax exemption for 100% disabled veterans retroactive to effective date of determination of total disability; requires State to reimburse municipalities for reimbursement of property taxes paid to veteran.
Title
Makes total property tax exemption for 100% disabled veterans retroactive to effective date of determination of total disability; requires State to reimburse municipalities for reimbursement of property taxes paid to veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S220 (Carry Over) 2020-12-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S220 (Carry Over) 2020-12-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1406 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A255 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2472 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S220 (Carry Over) 2020-12-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1406 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A255 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2472 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S220 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/220_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S220 |