NJ S2179 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A3695 (AS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A3695 (AS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates transportation network companies.
Title
Regulates transportation network companies.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Joseph Kyrillos [R] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] |
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Senate | Substituted by A3695 (AS/1R) |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Senate Substitution (20-3) (Sarlo) |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3695 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - Approved P.L.2017, c.26.