NJ S2173 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S801

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (18-15) (Weinberg)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies statutory exemptions from mandatory immunization requirements for child care center and school attendance.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies statutory exemptions from mandatory immunization requirements for child care center and school attendance.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-09SenateSenate Amendment (18-15) (Weinberg)
2019-12-12SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S801 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3818 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (17-15) (Weinberg)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback