NJ S2144 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2488

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"New Jersey Insurance Fair Conduct Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"New Jersey Insurance Fair Conduct Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
2018-06-07SenatePassed by the Senate (21-14)
2018-04-12SenateSenate Amendment (21-0) (Scutari)
2018-04-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2488 (Carry Over) 2016-09-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3850 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback