NJ S2140 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1696
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A1675 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A1675 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes prescribed burning in certain circumstances.
Title
Authorizes prescribed burning in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A1675 (1R) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1675 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.107.
A1696 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
A1696 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading