NJ S2116 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by A3591
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by A3591
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"New Voter Empowerment Act"; permits 17 year olds to vote in primary election if they turn 18 years old before next succeeding general election.
Title
"New Voter Empowerment Act"; permits 17 year olds to vote in primary election if they turn 18 years old before next succeeding general election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Senate | Substituted by A3591 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3591 (Same As) 2016-09-08 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly