NJ S2116 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Substituted by A1545 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Substituted by A1545 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law concerning certain professional and occupational licenses.
Title
Revises law concerning certain professional and occupational licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-18 | Senate | Substituted by A1545 (4R) |
2013-09-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1545 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Approved P.L.2013, c.182.