NJ S2107 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2599
Note: Carry Over of previous S1446
Note: Carry Over of previous A428
Note: Carry Over of previous S1446
Note: Carry Over of previous A428
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces references to "alien" and "illegal alien" in statutes with "foreign national" and "undocumented foreign national," respectively; prohibits use of those terms by executive branch agencies.
Title
Replaces references to "alien" and "illegal alien" in statutes with "foreign national" and "undocumented foreign national," respectively; prohibits use of those terms by executive branch agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2107 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1329 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1446 (Carry Over) 2018-09-27 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A428 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1329 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1446 (Carry Over) 2018-09-27 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A428 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2107 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2107_I1.HTM |