NJ S2107 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4399
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that PERS or PFRS member who continues to be volunteer firefighter or emergency services worker after retirement with employer from whom member retires has bona fide severance for compliance with State and federal law.*
Title
Provides that PERS or PFRS member who continues to be volunteer firefighter or emergency services worker after retirement with employer from whom member retires has bona fide severance for compliance with State and federal law.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A536 Acaa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A536 Acaa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A536 (2R) |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Tucker) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A536 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2107 (2R)
A4399 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4399 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee