NJ S2062 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-25 - Substituted by A763 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-25 - Substituted by A763 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Judiciary to revise or supplement fees, subject to limitations, to fund e-court information system and Legal Services of New Jersey; provides for review of such fees by Judiciary.
Title
Authorizes Judiciary to revise or supplement fees, subject to limitations, to fund e-court information system and Legal Services of New Jersey; provides for review of such fees by Judiciary.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A763 (ACS/1R) |
2012-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A763 (Same As) 2012-07-30 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2062 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2500/2062_I1.HTM |