NJ S2059 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3665
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A3123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A3123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows veteran or personal representative to withdraw honorable discharge papers from county clerk.
Title
Allows veteran or personal representative to withdraw honorable discharge papers from county clerk.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted by A3123 |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3123 (Same As) 2021-09-28 - Approved P.L.2021, c.241.
A3665 (Carry Over) 2018-03-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3665 (Carry Over) 2018-03-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee