NJ S2049 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1375
Note: Carry Foward to future A3130
Note: Carry Over of previous A2476
Note: Carry Over of previous S1752
Note: Carry Foward to future A3130
Note: Carry Over of previous A2476
Note: Carry Over of previous S1752
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Invalidates consumer contracts which require a waiver of right to file a consumer complaint.
Title
Invalidates consumer contracts which require a waiver of right to file a consumer complaint.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2049 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2049 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3125 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A2476 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1752 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2049 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3125 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A2476 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1752 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2049 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2049_I1.HTM |