NJ S2049 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S882
Note: Carry Foward to future A1781
Note: Carry Over of previous A4424
Note: Carry Foward to future A1781
Note: Carry Over of previous A4424
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes psychiatric advanced practice nurses to complete certain certificates required for involuntary commitment to treatment.
Title
Authorizes psychiatric advanced practice nurses to complete certain certificates required for involuntary commitment to treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2049 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S2049 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A2792 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A4424 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2049 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A2792 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A4424 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading