NJ S2049 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Substituted by A3325
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Substituted by A3325
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain cooperative purchasing agreements involving certain State and local government entities for certain purchases.
Title
Authorizes certain cooperative purchasing agreements involving certain State and local government entities for certain purchases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | Senate | Substituted by A3325 |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3325 (Same As) 2013-01-14 - Approved P.L.2013, c.4.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2049 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2500/2049_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2500/2049_R1.HTM |