NJ S2029 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1727
Note: Carry Foward to future A3393
Note: Carry Over of previous S1959
Note: Carry Over of previous A3594
Note: Carry Foward to future A3393
Note: Carry Over of previous S1959
Note: Carry Over of previous A3594
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates "Franklinite" as official mineral of State of NJ.
Title
Designates "Franklinite" as official mineral of State of NJ.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2029 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2029 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1959 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4188 (Same As) 2020-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3594 (Carry Over) 2018-03-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2029 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1959 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4188 (Same As) 2020-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3594 (Carry Over) 2018-03-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2029 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2029_I1.HTM |