NJ S2003 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3268
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Substituted by A2515
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Substituted by A2515
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Military Skills Council.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Military Skills Council.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Diane Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Senate | Substituted by A2515 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2515 (Same As) 2016-07-15 - Approved P.L.2016, c.16.
S3268 (Carry Over) 2015-12-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3268 (Carry Over) 2015-12-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading