NJ S2003 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-28 - Substituted by A2928
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-28 - Substituted by A2928
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects.
Title
Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Substituted by A2928 | |
2010-06-21 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-27 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2928 (Same As) 2010-08-31 - Approved P.L.2010, c.63.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S2003 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2500/2003_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2500/2003_R1.HTM |