NJ S2000 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - Substituted by A1796
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - Substituted by A1796
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits school district from denying student school breakfast or school lunch because payment is in arrears without prior notice to parent.
Title
Prohibits school district from denying student school breakfast or school lunch because payment is in arrears without prior notice to parent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Senate | Substituted by A1796 |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1796 (Same As) 2015-02-05 - Approved P.L.2015, c.15.