NJ S1997 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2842
Note: Carry Over of previous S3532
Note: Carry Over of previous A2441
Note: Carry Over of previous S3532
Note: Carry Over of previous A2441
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Main Street Economic Growth Program to encourage business development in small, highly developed municipalities.
Title
Establishes Main Street Economic Growth Program to encourage business development in small, highly developed municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1997 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1345 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S3532 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A2441 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1345 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S3532 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A2441 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee