NJ S1978 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1531
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A3019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A3019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Employment and Training Commission to prepare annual report on State workforce.
Title
Requires State Employment and Training Commission to prepare annual report on State workforce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-07 | Senate | Substituted by A3019 |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1978 (Carry Over) 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A3019
A3019 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.280.
A3019 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.280.