NJ S1961 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A669

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Consumer Access to Health Care Act"; eliminates requirement of joint protocol with physician for advanced practice nurses to prescribe medication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Consumer Access to Health Care Act"; eliminates requirement of joint protocol with physician for advanced practice nurses to prescribe medication.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A854 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A669 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback