NJ S1949 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-20 - Substituted by A2739 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-20 - Substituted by A2739 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs State Board of Education to promulgate regulations requiring school districts to develop a plan to establish stability in special education programming.
Title
Directs State Board of Education to promulgate regulations requiring school districts to develop a plan to establish stability in special education programming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-20 | Senate | Substituted by A2739 (1R) |
2012-11-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2739 (Same As) 2013-01-25 - Approved P.L.2013, c.19.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S1949 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2000/1949_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2000/1949_R1.HTM |