NJ S1945 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-18 - Substituted by A2969 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-18 - Substituted by A2969 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits Commissioner of Banking and Insurance to waive statutory liability-to-policyholders' surplus ratio on application by mortgage guaranty insurance company.
Title
Permits Commissioner of Banking and Insurance to waive statutory liability-to-policyholders' surplus ratio on application by mortgage guaranty insurance company.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-18 | Substituted by A2969 (1R) | |
2010-10-07 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2969 (Same As) 2010-11-30 - Approved P.L.2010, c.93.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S1945 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2000/1945_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2000/1945_R1.HTM |