NJ S189 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3691
Note: Carry Over of previous A4693
Note: Carry Over of previous A4693
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Scientific Conference Grant Program"; appropriates $250,000.
Title
Establishes "Scientific Conference Grant Program"; appropriates $250,000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3691 (Carry Over) 2023-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A4693 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A2353 (Same As) 2024-09-19 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4693 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A2353 (Same As) 2024-09-19 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S189 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S0500/189_I1.HTM |