NJ S1883 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S806

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires owner or operator of certain trains to have discharge response, cleanup, and contingency plans to transport certain hazardous materials by rail; requires NJ DOT to request bridge inspection reports from US DOT.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires owner or operator of certain trains to have discharge response, cleanup, and contingency plans to transport certain hazardous materials by rail; requires NJ DOT to request bridge inspection reports from US DOT.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
2018-06-25SenatePassed by the Senate (26-13)
2018-06-11SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-03-12SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S806 (Carry Over) 2017-07-13 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A3783 (Same As) 2018-04-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback