NJ S1877 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A3380 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"New Jersey Health Insurance Market Preservation Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"New Jersey Health Insurance Market Preservation Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateSubstituted by A3380 (1R)
2018-04-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-04-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateRecommitted to Senate Commerce Committee
2018-03-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-02-15SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3380 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.31.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback