NJ S1847 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by A555
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises statutes concerning incorporation and governance of the Protestant Episcopal Church to remove gender-specific references.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises statutes concerning incorporation and governance of the Protestant Episcopal Church to remove gender-specific references.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateSubstituted by A555
2017-06-26SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-03-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A555 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.151.
A3663 (Carry Over) 2015-01-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback