NJ S1844 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Substituted by A2684 (ACS/3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Substituted by A2684 (ACS/3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Menhaden Personal Use and Limited Sale License, and permits use of certain gear for taking of menhaden.
Title
Establishes Menhaden Personal Use and Limited Sale License, and permits use of certain gear for taking of menhaden.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A2684 (ACS/3R) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2684 (Same As) 2014-09-10 - Approved P.L.2014, c.57.