NJ S1821 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes temporary mortgage relief programs for certain owners of real property damaged by "Superstorm Sandy."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes temporary mortgage relief programs for certain owners of real property damaged by "Superstorm Sandy."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
2016-05-09SenatePassed by the Senate (34-1)
2016-03-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-03-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2577 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback