NJ S1814 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1866

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the Tuition Aid Grant program to part-time undergraduates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the Tuition Aid Grant program to part-time undergraduates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15SenateWithdrawn from Consideration
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1866 (Carry Over) 2016-03-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2403 (Same As) 2018-04-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback