NJ S1794 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs installation of electric vehicle charging stations at service areas on State's toll roads.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs installation of electric vehicle charging stations at service areas on State's toll roads.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-19SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-03-17SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3298 (Same As) 2014-06-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A1728 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Passed by the Assembly (44-27-2)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback