NJ S177 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2727

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on School District Regionalization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Task Force on School District Regionalization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-14AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2016-03-14SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2016-03-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2727 (Carry Over) 2015-12-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3940 (Same As) 2016-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback