NJ S1710 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2375
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to establish single license for facilities providing integrated behavioral and physical health care.*
Title
Requires DOH to establish single license for facilities providing integrated behavioral and physical health care.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3475 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A3475 (ACS) |
2017-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Senate Substitution (34-0) (Vitale) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2375 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A3475 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S1710 (SS)
A3475 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S1710 (SS)