NJ S1676 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1616
Note: Carry Over of previous S2821
Note: Carry Over of previous S2821
Note: Carry Over of previous S2821
Note: Carry Over of previous S2821
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates striped bass license plates.
Title
Creates striped bass license plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1676 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S2821 (Carry Over) 2015-03-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A3174 (Same As) 2016-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S2821 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2821 (Carry Over) 2015-03-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A3174 (Same As) 2016-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S2821 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S1676 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S2000/1676_I1.HTM |