NJ S1642 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2117
Note: Carry Over of previous S2255
Note: Carry Over of previous S2255
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires physicians and other prescribers to obtain informed consent from parents or guardians of minors for certain medications with "black box warnings."
Title
Requires physicians and other prescribers to obtain informed consent from parents or guardians of minors for certain medications with "black box warnings."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1642 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2255 (Carry Over) 2016-05-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4945 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S2255 (Carry Over) 2016-05-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4945 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee