NJ S1639 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Upgrades penalties for drag racing.
Title
Upgrades penalties for drag racing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee | |
2010-05-20 | Passed by the Senate (37-1) | |
2010-05-10 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1283 (Same As) 2010-01-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee