NJ S1608 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3041
Note: Carry Over of previous A872
Note: Carry Over of previous A872
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens eligibility for certain civil service and pension benefits for veterans by eliminating requirement of service during specified dates or in specified locations.
Title
Broadens eligibility for certain civil service and pension benefits for veterans by eliminating requirement of service during specified dates or in specified locations.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Carmen Amato [R] | Sen. James Holzapfel [R] | Sen. Owen Henry [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3041 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A872 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3161 (Same As) 2024-12-12 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A872 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3161 (Same As) 2024-12-12 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S1608 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2000/1608_I1.HTM |