NJ S1599 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-20 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-20 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain gestational carrier agreements.
Title
Authorizes certain gestational carrier agreements.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Barbara Buono [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Sen. Diane Allen [R] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2646 Aa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2646 Aa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-20 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (41-33-2) |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A2646 (1R) |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-11) |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Vitale) |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2646 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - Substituted by S1599 (1R)